Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Administrative Procedure Act

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 (SB0449)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 /CH0102
Title
Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Appeals Under the Maryland Public Information Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB0166)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 (SB0449) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0658 /CH0102 Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Appeals Under the Maryland Public Information Act Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0449 (HB0166) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page