Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861
Title
Independent Adoption – Consent of Petitioner’s Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 Independent Adoption – Consent of Petitioner’s Spouse Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page