Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Adultery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281
Title
Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0281 Crimes - Adultery - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0883 Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page