Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014 (SB0048)
Title
Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312)
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467 (SB0994)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 (HB0014)
Title
Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311)
Title
Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1467)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 (SB0048) Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312) Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1467 (SB0994) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0048 (HB0014) Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311) Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0994 (HB1467) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page