Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Age of Majority -see also- Minors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0045
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0135)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 (SB0807)
Title
Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Requirement – Repeal (Maryland’s Constitutional Carry Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0171)
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1017)
Title
Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0045 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 (SB0135) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1017 (SB0807) Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB1206 Public Safety – Handgun Permit Requirement – Repeal (Maryland’s Constitutional Carry Act of 2022) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0135 (HB0171) Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0807 (HB1017) Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page