Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0658)
Title
Transportation – Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551
Title
Criminal Procedure – Fresh Pursuit by Law Enforcement – Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB1103)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686
Title
Department of the Environment - Study on Environmental Impacts of Lead-Based Fuel Use by Aviation Industry
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0545 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB0658) Transportation – Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0551 Criminal Procedure – Fresh Pursuit by Law Enforcement – Requirements and Prohibitions Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB1103) Transportation - Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 Department of the Environment - Study on Environmental Impacts of Lead-Based Fuel Use by Aviation Industry Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page