Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Air Pollution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 (SB0148)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111
Title
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Income Tax – Healthy Indoor Air Quality Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0835)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141
Title
Baltimore County - Public Schools - Air Quality Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 (HB0051)
Title
Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0066)
Title
Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329
Title
Income Tax – Credit for the Purchase and Installation of Indoor Air Quality Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB0803)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 (SB0148) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0111 Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0778 Income Tax – Healthy Indoor Air Quality Tax Credit Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0803 (SB0835) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1141 Baltimore County - Public Schools - Air Quality Testing Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0121 (HB0051) Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0148 (HB0066) Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0329 Income Tax – Credit for the Purchase and Installation of Indoor Air Quality Equipment Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB0803) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page