Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0709 (SB0372/CH0710)
Title
Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 (SB0142)
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Gaming – Video Lottery Operation License – Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0658)
Title
Transportation – Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 (HB0393)
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB1103)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 /CH0709 (SB0372/CH0710) Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0393 (SB0142) State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
HB0733 Gaming – Video Lottery Operation License – Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB0658) Transportation – Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1294 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0142 (HB0393) State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0658 (HB1103) Transportation - Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page