Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 (SB0675)
Title
Property and Income Taxes – Credits for Construction and Purchase of Housing in Western Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256)
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0846)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0848)
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143 /CH0433 (SB0969)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386
Title
Natural Resources - Black Bear Hunting - Permit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0843)
Title
Property and Income Taxes – Credits for Construction and Purchase of Housing in Western Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB1094)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1129)
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1143/CH0433)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County – All–Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 (SB0675) Property and Income Taxes – Credits for Construction and Purchase of Housing in Western Maryland Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256) Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1094 (SB0846) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0848) Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Garrett County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB1143 /CH0433 (SB0969) Allegany County and Garrett County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1386 Natural Resources - Black Bear Hunting - Permit Requirements Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0843) Property and Income Taxes – Credits for Construction and Purchase of Housing in Western Maryland Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 (HB1094) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 (HB1129) Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0969 (HB1143/CH0433) Allegany County and Garrett County – All–Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2022 4:28 PM
Click to return on the top page