Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0295)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 (SB0126)
Title
Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0070)
Title
Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 /CH0421
Title
Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Property Acquisition and Construction of Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 (HB0776)
Title
Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0060)
Title
Environment - New Motor Vehicles - Pollution Fee
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0044)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 (SB0295) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
1/19/2022 - 2:50 PM
Appropriations
Rules
HB0060 (SB0126) Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0776 (SB0070) Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0930 /CH0421 Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Property Acquisition and Construction of Facilities Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0010 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 (HB0776) Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0126 (HB0060) Environment - New Motor Vehicles - Pollution Fee Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0044) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0949 Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page