Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Animal Shelters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income – Animal Control Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1064)
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income – Animal Control Officers Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 Civil Actions - Tortious Injury or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1064 (SB0816) Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0816 (HB1064) Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/24/2022 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page