Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0897
Title
Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 (SB0141)
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0744 (SB0689)
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Rental Property - Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 (SB0695)
Title
Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Real Property - Residential Rental Apartments - Air-Conditioning Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligible Properties - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0199)
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Apartment Building Height Allowances – Study and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0823/CH0744)
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0889)
Title
Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0897 Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 897
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0199 (SB0141) Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Wu 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0823 /CH0744 (SB0689) Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Rental Property - Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0889 (SB0695) Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Real Property - Residential Rental Apartments - Air-Conditioning Requirements Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligible Properties - Alteration Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 (HB0199) Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 Maryland Building Performance Standards – Apartment Building Height Allowances – Study and Alterations Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0689 (HB0823/CH0744) Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0695 (HB0889) Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page