Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010 (SB0061/CH0463)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024 /CH0209 (SB0004/CH0208)
Title
Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0525)
Title
Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0498)
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0318)
Title
More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719 (SB0420)
Title
Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000
Title
Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0840)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Task Force to Study Solar Energy Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285 (SB0604)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0208 (HB0024/CH0209)
Title
Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0463 (HB0010)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0125
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318 (HB0652)
Title
More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0719)
Title
Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0132)
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0088)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB1285)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1084)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeships and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 (SB0061/CH0463) Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0024 /CH0209 (SB0004/CH0208) Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Appropriations
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0088 (SB0525) Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0132 (SB0498) Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022) Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 (SB0318) More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2022 Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0719 (SB0420) Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1000 Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1084 (SB0840) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1208 Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1250 Task Force to Study Solar Energy Incentives Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 (SB0604) Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0004 /CH0208 (HB0024/CH0209) Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0061 /CH0463 (HB0010) Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions) Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0205 /CH0125 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0318 (HB0652) More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0420 (HB0719) Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0498 (HB0132) Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0525 (HB0088) Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0604 (HB1285) Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0840 (HB1084) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0926 Labor and Employment - Apprenticeships and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page