Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0188)
Title
Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Local Commissions - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0564 (SB0570/CH0563)
Title
Public Utilities – Thermal Energy Network Systems – Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 (SB0359)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429 (SB0043)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0132 (SB0591)
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 /CH0968
Title
Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 (HB0429)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0114)
Title
Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0425)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0563 (HB0397/CH0564)
Title
Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0609/CH0132)
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0114 (SB0188) Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024 Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Procedures Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0279 Common Ownership Communities - Local Commissions - Requirements Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0397 /CH0564 (SB0570/CH0563) Public Utilities – Thermal Energy Network Systems – Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Economic Matters
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0425 (SB0359) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0429 (SB0043) Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0609 /CH0132 (SB0591) Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Appropriations
2/13/2024 - 12:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1402 /CH0968 Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 968
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 (HB0429) Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0114) Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024 Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0359 (HB0425) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 /CH0563 (HB0397/CH0564) Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act) Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0591 (HB0609/CH0132) Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page