Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB0429)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734
Title
State Procurement - Preference for Resident Bidders or Offerors
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0237)
Title
Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 (HB0877)
Title
Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0548)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0548 (SB0429) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence Commission Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0734 State Procurement - Preference for Resident Bidders or Offerors Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0877 (SB0237) Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0237 (HB0877) Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 (HB0548) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence Commission Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page