Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0165)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Felony Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0294)
Title
Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0294 (SB0165) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Felony Convictions Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1154 Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB0294) Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0208 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/14/2022 4:28 PM
Click to return on the top page