Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 (SB0238)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jubilee Association of Maryland Community Center
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 (SB0091)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0861)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994 (SB0740)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Brooke Grove Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189 (SB0729)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0282)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Assisted Living Services
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 (HB0143)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jubilee Association of Maryland Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1189)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB0994)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Brooke Grove Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0661)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 (SB0238) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jubilee Association of Maryland Community Center Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB0282 (SB0091) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
HB0373 Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0661 (SB0861) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0876 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 (SB0740) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Brooke Grove Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1189 (SB0729) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0282) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0138 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Assisted Living Services Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0238 (HB0143) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jubilee Association of Maryland Community Center Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 AM
SB0597 Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0729 (HB1189) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 (HB0994) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Brooke Grove Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0661) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page