Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276
Title
Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0537 (SB0386/CH0538)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 /CH0479 (SB0204/CH0480)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0471 (SB0507/CH0472)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 (SB0707)
Title
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 (HB0806)
Title
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0480 (HB0416/CH0479)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 /CH0538 (HB0312/CH0537)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0472 (HB0554/CH0471)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 (HB1033)
Title
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Membership and Cochairs
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2021 - 3:45 PM
HB0312 /CH0537 (SB0386/CH0538) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License Delegate Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0416 /CH0479 (SB0204/CH0480) Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0554 /CH0471 (SB0507/CH0472) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0623 Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0962 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1033 (SB0707) Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1292 Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0047 (HB0806) Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0480 (HB0416/CH0479) Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Requirements for Alzheimer's Special Care Units and Regulations Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0386 /CH0538 (HB0312/CH0537) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Assisted Living Program License Harford County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0472 (HB0554/CH0471) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0707 (HB1033) Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0795 Oversight Committee on Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Membership and Cochairs Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page