Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0406
Title
Corporations and Associations – Filing Fee Study
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0203 (SB0533/CH0204)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 /CH0525
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 /CH0204 (HB0482/CH0203)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 /CH0406 Corporations and Associations – Filing Fee Study Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 406
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0482 /CH0203 (SB0533/CH0204) Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0681 /CH0525 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
SB0533 /CH0204 (HB0482/CH0203) Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:17 PM
Click to return on the top page