Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Audiologists and Speech Pathologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657
Title
Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Physician Members - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231
Title
Public Schools - Student Health Professional Retention Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Apraxia Awareness Day
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2022 - 4:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0657 Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Physician Members - Repeal Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1231 Public Schools - Student Health Professional Retention Program - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SJ0001 Apraxia Awareness Day Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page