Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Autism Spectrum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177
Title
9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Registered Behavior Technicians – Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0627
Title
Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs and the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy - Membership, Staffing, and Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169
Title
State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0177 9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0627 Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Registered Behavior Technicians – Reimbursement Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0662 /CH0627 Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs and the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy - Membership, Staffing, and Appointment Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0169 State Autism Strategy – Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page