Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Awards, Medals, and Prizes -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 /CH0684 (SB0200)
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 /CH0205
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 (HB0293/CH0684)
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0258
Title
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0293 /CH0684 (SB0200) Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0654 /CH0205 Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program - Alterations Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 (HB0293/CH0684) Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0689 /CH0258 Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page