Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page