Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0063 (SB0492)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 /CH0502 (SB0060/CH0503)
Title
State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341 /CH0111
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0503 (HB0887/CH0502)
Title
State Debt - Annuity Bond Fund - Use of Bond Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182
Title
State Finance – General Obligation Debt – Application of Minority Business Participation Goals
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB0590/CH0063)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0728
Title
Capital Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Goals
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0590 /CH0063 (SB0492) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0887 /CH0502 (SB0060/CH0503) State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums Delegate Chang 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1055 Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1341 /CH0111 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0503 (HB0887/CH0502) State Debt - Annuity Bond Fund - Use of Bond Premiums Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0182 State Finance – General Obligation Debt – Application of Minority Business Participation Goals Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0492 (HB0590/CH0063) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0909 /CH0728 Capital Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Goals Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page