Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Ballots -see also- Abs&MailInBallots; Abs&MailInVoting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 (SB0093)
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Notice to Request Application
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322 (SB0088)
Title
Election Law - Municipal Elections - Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Wims
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 (SB0313)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
General Assembly - Criminal Offenses - Mens Rea Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Election Law - Registered Voter List and Petitions (Ballot Petition Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Elections for County Boards of Education - Party Designation or Affiliation - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballots
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 (SB0615)
Title
Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Contents, Plain Language Requirement, and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0543)
Title
Election Law - Provisional Ballots - Nonpartisan Board of Education Contests
Sponsor
Delegate Roberson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 (SB0685)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Language Assistance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 9-25
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1534 (SB0758)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Elections, Financial Statements, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289
Title
Baltimore City - Removal of Debt Ballot Questions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB0426)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0839)
Title
Election Law - Provisional Ballots - Nonpartisan Board of Education Contests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0816)
Title
Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Contents, Plain Language Requirement, and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 (HB0983)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Language Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1534)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Elections, Financial Statements, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0201 (SB0093) Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Notice to Request Application Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0322 (SB0088) Election Law - Municipal Elections - Administration Delegate Wims 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0426 (SB0313) Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0518 General Assembly - Criminal Offenses - Mens Rea Requirement Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0642 Election Law - Registered Voter List and Petitions (Ballot Petition Modernization Act) Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0733 Elections for County Boards of Education - Party Designation or Affiliation - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballots Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0816 (SB0615) Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Contents, Plain Language Requirement, and Procedures Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0543) Election Law - Provisional Ballots - Nonpartisan Board of Education Contests Delegate Roberson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0983 (SB0685) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Language Assistance Program Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1075 Calvert County Board of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1094 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 9-25 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1534 (SB0758) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Elections, Financial Statements, and Enforcement Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 Baltimore City - Removal of Debt Ballot Questions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0313 (HB0426) Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0543 (HB0839) Election Law - Provisional Ballots - Nonpartisan Board of Education Contests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0615 (HB0816) Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Contents, Plain Language Requirement, and Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0685 (HB0983) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Language Assistance Program Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0758 (HB1534) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Elections, Financial Statements, and Enforcement Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:36 PM
Click to return on the top page