Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0756)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0835)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756 (HB0929)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1184)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0372 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 (SB0756) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1184 (SB0835) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0756 (HB0929) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1184) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page