Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 /CH0765 (SB0458/CH0766)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695
Title
State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Reporting Database - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0772)
Title
Small Business COVID-19 Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 /CH0426
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458 /CH0766 (HB0504/CH0765)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 /CH0190
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1014)
Title
Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 /CH0193
Title
Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0504 /CH0765 (SB0458/CH0766) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0695 State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Reporting Database - Study Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1014 (SB0772) Small Business COVID-19 Relief Act of 2021 Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1213 /CH0426 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0238 Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 /CH0766 (HB0504/CH0765) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 /CH0190 Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0772 (HB1014) Small Business COVID–19 Relief Act of 2021 Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0933 /CH0193 Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Finance
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page