Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Barbers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 /CH0557 (SB0694/CH0558)
Title
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317 /CH0194
Title
Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 /CH0558 (HB1270/CH0557)
Title
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1270 /CH0557 (SB0694/CH0558) Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 557
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1317 /CH0194 Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 /CH0558 (HB1270/CH0557) Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page