Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Barbers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0834 (SB0738/CH0835)
Title
Frederick County - Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine License - Alterations
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 /CH0836
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License MC 3-25
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0812 (SB0939/CH0811)
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorizations and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400 (SB0823)
Title
No Tax on Tips Act
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547 /CH0286
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - License Qualifications - Domestic Violence Awareness Training
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 /CH0835 (HB0512/CH0834)
Title
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine License – Alterations
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815
Title
Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB1400)
Title
No Tax on Tips Act
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0811 (HB1172/CH0812)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Authorizations and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0512 /CH0834 (SB0738/CH0835) Frederick County - Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine License - Alterations Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 834
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1095 /CH0836 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License MC 3-25 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 836
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0812 (SB0939/CH0811) Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorizations and Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 812
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1400 (SB0823) No Tax on Tips Act Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1547 /CH0286 Barbers and Cosmetologists - License Qualifications - Domestic Violence Awareness Training Delegate Jones, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Economic Matters
3/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0738 /CH0835 (HB0512/CH0834) Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine License – Alterations Frederick County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 835
Finance
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0815 Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 (HB1400) No Tax on Tips Act Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0939 /CH0811 (HB1172/CH0812) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Authorizations and Revisions Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 811
Finance
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2025 3:59 PM
Click to return on the top page