Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168
Title
Environment - Plastic Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 /CH1004 (SB0561/CH1005)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB0833)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Sale or Delivery for Off–Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0642)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762 /CH1021
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption MC 9-24
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 /CH0774 (SB0456/CH0775)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841
Title
Environment - Plastic Bottle Waste Reduction - Water Bottle Filling Stations and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH1024 (SB0853/CH1025)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 /CH1028 (SB0904/CH1029)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 /CH0775 (HB0808/CH0774)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 /CH1005 (HB0587/CH1004)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0735)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0637)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 /CH1029 (HB1089/CH1028)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1041 /CH0918 (HB1217)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0168 Environment - Plastic Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0587 /CH1004 (SB0561/CH1005) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1004
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0637 (SB0833) Alcoholic Beverages – Sale or Delivery for Off–Premises Consumption Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0642) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0762 /CH1021 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption MC 9-24 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1021
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0808 /CH0774 (SB0456/CH0775) Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0841 Environment - Plastic Bottle Waste Reduction - Water Bottle Filling Stations and Reporting Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 /CH1024 (SB0853/CH1025) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1024
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1089 /CH1028 (SB0904/CH1029) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Delegate Clippinger 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1028
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0456 /CH0775 (HB0808/CH0774) Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit Senator Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0561 /CH1005 (HB0587/CH1004) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit Frederick County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1005
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0642 (HB0735) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB0637) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0904 /CH1029 (HB1089/CH1028) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1029
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB1041 /CH0918 (HB1217) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 918
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page