Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Bicycles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0880)
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 (SB0552)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis Plan – Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Vehicle Laws – Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles – Riding on Sidewalks
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0118
Title
Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0695)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB0656)
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0656 (SB0880) Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022 Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0695 (SB0552) Environment – Climate Crisis Plan – Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
HB1153 Vehicle Laws – Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles – Riding on Sidewalks Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 /CH0118 Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0552 (HB0695) Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0880 (HB0656) Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022 Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page