Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Bingo

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0170
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892)
Title
Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0564 /CH0170 Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892) Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187) Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page