Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Natural Resources - Waterfowl Hunting - Susquehanna Flats
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Baltimore County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004 (SJ0006)
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0004)
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission – Atlantic Menhaden – Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0236 Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 Natural Resources - Waterfowl Hunting - Susquehanna Flats Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
HB0928 Baltimore County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HJ0004 (SJ0006) Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0899 Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0004) Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission – Atlantic Menhaden – Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/26/2021 5:50 PM
Click to return on the top page