Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0527 (SB0461/CH0528)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941
Title
Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202 (SB0754/CH0241)
Title
Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0528 (HB0723/CH0527)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 /CH0241 (HB1202)
Title
Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0466 Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0723 /CH0527 (SB0461/CH0528) State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers Delegate Charles 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 (SB0754/CH0241) Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0461 /CH0528 (HB0723/CH0527) State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers Senator Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 /CH0241 (HB1202) Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page