Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0185)
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195 /CH0739 (SB0817)
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0518
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Catching of Oysters or Clams - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0581/CH0192)
Title
School Construction Revolving Loan Fund - Maryland School for the Blind - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0744 (SB0689)
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Rental Property - Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 /CH0443 (SB1084/CH0442)
Title
Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076 /CH0749 (SB1091/CH0750)
Title
Education - Blind and Visually Impaired Students - Textbook Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Roberts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0098)
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 /CH0578
Title
State Procurement - Preferred Provider Requirements - Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0192 (HB0643)
Title
Public School Construction Program - Maryland School for the Blind - State and Local Cost-Share
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0823/CH0744)
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0195/CH0739)
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0442 (HB1069/CH0443)
Title
Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1091 /CH0750 (HB1076/CH0749)
Title
Education – Blind and Visually Impaired Students – Textbook Equity
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0185) Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0195 /CH0739 (SB0817) Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0613 /CH0518 Natural Resources - Recreational Catching of Oysters or Clams - Requirements Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0643 (SB0581/CH0192) School Construction Revolving Loan Fund - Maryland School for the Blind - Eligibility Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0823 /CH0744 (SB0689) Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Rental Property - Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1069 /CH0443 (SB1084/CH0442) Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established Delegate Kaufman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1076 /CH0749 (SB1091/CH0750) Education - Blind and Visually Impaired Students - Textbook Equity Delegate Roberts 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 749
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0185 (HB0098) Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2024 - 3:00 PM
SB0194 /CH0578 State Procurement - Preferred Provider Requirements - Waiver Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0581 /CH0192 (HB0643) Public School Construction Program - Maryland School for the Blind - State and Local Cost-Share Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0689 (HB0823/CH0744) Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0817 (HB0195/CH0739) Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1084 /CH0442 (HB1069/CH0443) Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established Senator Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1091 /CH0750 (HB1076/CH0749) Education – Blind and Visually Impaired Students – Textbook Equity Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/23/2024 - 9:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page