Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Blue Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0390 (SB0140)
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0389 (SB0098)
Title
Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 /CH0429 (SB0220)
Title
Calvert County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 /CH0751
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 301-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0424 (SB0388)
Title
Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0766 (SB0415/CH0767)
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444)
Title
Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0514/CH0424)
Title
Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0767 (HB1118/CH0766)
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 /CH0390 (SB0140) Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0143 /CH0389 (SB0098) Somerset County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0170 /CH0429 (SB0220) Calvert County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0357 /CH0751 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 301-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 /CH0424 (SB0388) Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1118 /CH0766 (SB0415/CH0767) Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444) Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0388 (HB0514/CH0424) Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0415 /CH0767 (HB1118/CH0766) Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 767
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page