Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Boats and Ships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195 /CH0428 (SB0454)
Title
Marine Contractor License - Authorization, Requirements, and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0410 (SB0455/CH0409)
Title
Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 (SB0826/CH0384)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0195/CH0428)
Title
Marine Contractor License - Authorization, Requirements, and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 /CH0409 (HB0601/CH0410)
Title
Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0384 (HB1242)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0195 /CH0428 (SB0454) Marine Contractor License - Authorization, Requirements, and Fees Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0601 /CH0410 (SB0455/CH0409) Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0954 Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1242 (SB0826/CH0384) Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
SB0084 Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0454 (HB0195/CH0428) Marine Contractor License - Authorization, Requirements, and Fees Senator Bailey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0455 /CH0409 (HB0601/CH0410) Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0826 /CH0384 (HB1242) Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page