Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Building Permits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0096 (SB0032/CH0097)
Title
Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705
Title
Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224
Title
Anne Arundel County - Restriction on Use - Construction of Private Piers
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285 (SB0604)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 /CH0097 (HB0012/CH0096)
Title
Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0096 (SB0032/CH0097) Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0705 Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 Anne Arundel County - Restriction on Use - Construction of Private Piers Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1285 (SB0604) Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0032 /CH0097 (HB0012/CH0096) Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page