Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Buses -see also- School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033 (SB0076)
Title
Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0843)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0242)
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 (SB0137)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 (HB0033)
Title
Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 (HB0334)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0116)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0067)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 (SB0076) Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0067 (SB0843) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0116 (SB0242) Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0284 Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0334 (SB0137) Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 11:00 a.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0847 Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0076 (HB0033) Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0091 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 (HB0334) Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act) Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0242 (HB0116) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 (HB0067) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page