Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB1157)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Funding of Reserve Accounts and Preparation of Funding Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0256 (SB0015/CH0255)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0429/CH0862)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 (SB0510)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826 (SB0779)
Title
Real Property – Taxation of Vacant Property, Certification of Company Representatives, and Short–Term Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Reserve Studies - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382
Title
Corporations and Associations - Methodist Church Trust Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1399
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Public Information
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0255 (HB0309/CH0256)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Cooperative Association Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0487)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0826)
Title
Real Property - Taxation of Vacant Property, Certification of Company Representatives, and Short-Term Rentals
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954
Title
Corporations and Associations - Transparency - Beneficial Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1157 (HB0281)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Funding of Reserve Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0271 Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 (SB1157) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Funding of Reserve Accounts and Preparation of Funding Plans Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0309 /CH0256 (SB0015/CH0255) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0391 (SB0429/CH0862) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0487 (SB0510) Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0826 (SB0779) Real Property – Taxation of Vacant Property, Certification of Company Representatives, and Short–Term Rentals Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1262 Common Ownership Communities - Reserve Studies - Alterations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act) Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1382 Corporations and Associations - Methodist Church Trust Requirement - Repeal Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1399 Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Public Information Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0255 (HB0309/CH0256) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Cooperative Association Act) Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 862
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 (HB0487) Corporations and Associations - Electric Cooperatives - Nonescheat Capital Credits Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0779 (HB0826) Real Property - Taxation of Vacant Property, Certification of Company Representatives, and Short-Term Rentals Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 Corporations and Associations - Transparency - Beneficial Ownership Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1157 (HB0281) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Funding of Reserve Accounts Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page