Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030 (SB0228/CH0415)
Title
Limited Line Credit Insurance - Qualification of Applicants
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100 /CH0351 (SB0102/CH0350)
Title
Insurance Pooling - Public Entity - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Premium Increase - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0006 (SB0279/CH0005)
Title
Employment and Insurance Equality for Service Members Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0394 (SB0757)
Title
Disability and Life Insurance - Medical Information (Genetic Testing Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 /CH0396
Title
Life and Health Insurance Policies and Annuity and Health Maintenance Organization Contracts - Discretionary Clauses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Woorman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098 /CH0395
Title
Insurance - Automobile Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund and Affordability Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1148 /CH0381
Title
Residential Condominium Unit Insurance - Lapses in Coverage - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Insurance - Property and Casualty Insurance - Minimum Acceptable Loss Ratio and Premium Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 (SB0607)
Title
Human Remains - Transportation Protection Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Hospitals and Medical Professional Liability Insurers - Obstetric Services Policies (Doula and Birth Policy Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102 /CH0350 (HB0100/CH0351)
Title
Insurance Pooling - Public Entity - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0415 (HB0030)
Title
Limited Line Credit Insurance - Qualification of Applicants
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0005 (HB0895/CH0006)
Title
Employment and Insurance Equality for Service Members Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Collisions With Wild Animals - Prohibited Actions by Insurers
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB1220)
Title
Human Remains - Transportation Protection Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Premium Discounts - Methodology
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 (HB1007/CH0394)
Title
Disability and Life Insurance - Medical Information (Genetic Testing Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771
Title
Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Programs - Insurance and Liability
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893
Title
Insurance - Enforcement, Impaired Entities, Homeowner's Insurance Policies, and Unfair Claim Settlement Practices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Programs That Measure the Operation of an Insured Vehicle
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 (SB0228/CH0415) Limited Line Credit Insurance - Qualification of Applicants Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0100 /CH0351 (SB0102/CH0350) Insurance Pooling - Public Entity - Definition Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0148 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Premium Increase - Prohibition Delegate Ziegler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 /CH0006 (SB0279/CH0005) Employment and Insurance Equality for Service Members Act Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Economic Matters
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1007 /CH0394 (SB0757) Disability and Life Insurance - Medical Information (Genetic Testing Protection Act) Delegate Wells 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1069 /CH0396 Life and Health Insurance Policies and Annuity and Health Maintenance Organization Contracts - Discretionary Clauses - Prohibition Delegate Woorman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2025 - 12:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 /CH0395 Insurance - Automobile Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund and Affordability Study Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Economic Matters
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1148 /CH0381 Residential Condominium Unit Insurance - Lapses in Coverage - Prohibition on Denial Delegate Wivell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Economic Matters
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 Insurance - Property and Casualty Insurance - Minimum Acceptable Loss Ratio and Premium Refunds Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 (SB0607) Human Remains - Transportation Protection Agreements Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
Economic Matters
HB1251 Hospitals and Medical Professional Liability Insurers - Obstetric Services Policies (Doula and Birth Policy Transparency Act) Delegate Toles 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0102 /CH0350 (HB0100/CH0351) Insurance Pooling - Public Entity - Definition Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Finance
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0415 (HB0030) Limited Line Credit Insurance - Qualification of Applicants Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Finance
1/23/2025 - 3:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0279 /CH0005 (HB0895/CH0006) Employment and Insurance Equality for Service Members Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Finance
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
SB0551 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Collisions With Wild Animals - Prohibited Actions by Insurers Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 (HB1220) Human Remains - Transportation Protection Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0697 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Premium Discounts - Methodology Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 (HB1007/CH0394) Disability and Life Insurance - Medical Information (Genetic Testing Protection Act) Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0771 Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Programs - Insurance and Liability Senator Gile 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0893 Insurance - Enforcement, Impaired Entities, Homeowner's Insurance Policies, and Unfair Claim Settlement Practices - Revisions Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Programs That Measure the Operation of an Insured Vehicle Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:55 PM
Click to return on the top page