Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0203 (SB0533/CH0204)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988
Title
Horse Racing – Development of Pimlico Racing Facility Communities – Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168)
Title
Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391
Title
Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 /CH0204 (HB0482/CH0203)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0482 /CH0203 (SB0533/CH0204) Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0988 Horse Racing – Development of Pimlico Racing Facility Communities – Memorandum of Understanding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168) Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0391 Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0533 /CH0204 (HB0482/CH0203) Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167) Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:45 PM
Click to return on the top page