Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Housing and Community Development (C9)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039 (SB0608)
Title
Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0183 (SB0560/CH0184)
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homeowner's Extreme Weather Mitigation and Preparation Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927 /CH0336 (SB0744/CH0337)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
Sports Wagering - Prince George's County Stadiums - Sports Wagering Community Impact Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983
Title
Housing and Community Development - Expansion of Affordable Housing - County Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104
Title
Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Funding and Property Tax Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Partnership Rental Housing Program - Mixed-Income Housing Developments (More Homes for Marylanders Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451 /CH0380
Title
Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560 /CH0184 (HB0385/CH0183)
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 (HB0039)
Title
Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 /CH0337 (HB0927/CH0336)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0039 (SB0608) Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 /CH0183 (SB0560/CH0184) Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0537 Housing and Community Development - Homeowner's Extreme Weather Mitigation and Preparation Grant Program Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0927 /CH0336 (SB0744/CH0337) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0929 Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 Sports Wagering - Prince George's County Stadiums - Sports Wagering Community Impact Fund Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0983 Housing and Community Development - Expansion of Affordable Housing - County Grants Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1104 Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Funding and Property Tax Exemption Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1330 Partnership Rental Housing Program - Mixed-Income Housing Developments (More Homes for Marylanders Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 /CH0380 Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0560 /CH0184 (HB0385/CH0183) Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 (HB0039) Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 /CH0337 (HB0927/CH0336) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page