Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 /CH0246
Title
Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 /CH0416
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 /CH0302
Title
Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and Status
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268 /CH0506
Title
Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0650
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 /CH0138
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483
Title
Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0140
Title
Calvert County - Economic Development Incentive Fund - Eligibility Criteria
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 /CH0417
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit - Attendance
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 /CH0246 Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree Programs Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1156 /CH0416 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1157 /CH0302 Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and Status Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 /CH0506 Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1353 /CH0650 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Permit Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1445 /CH0138 Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1483 Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 /CH0140 Calvert County - Economic Development Incentive Fund - Eligibility Criteria Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0249 Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 /CH0417 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0625 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit - Attendance Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page