Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0915)
Title
Baltimore County - Vehicle Laws - Private Roadways in Residential Communities
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0816)
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0335)
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Calvert County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Qualified Data Centers
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Tobacco Barns
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161
Title
Calvert County - CalvertHealth Medical Center
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370 (SB0881)
Title
Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Spiegel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401
Title
Calvert County Commissioners - Prohibited Gatherings and Events
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Long-Term Contracts for Infrastructure and Asset Management
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540
Title
Calvert County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Emergency Services
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767
Title
Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB0651)
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1370)
Title
Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935
Title
Transportation - Regional Authorities - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 (SB0915) Baltimore County - Vehicle Laws - Private Roadways in Residential Communities Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0651 (SB0816) Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 (SB0335) Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0949 Calvert County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Qualified Data Centers Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Tobacco Barns Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 Calvert County Board of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1160 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 Calvert County - CalvertHealth Medical Center Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 (SB0881) Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities Delegate Spiegel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1401 Calvert County Commissioners - Prohibited Gatherings and Events Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 Calvert County - Procurement - Long-Term Contracts for Infrastructure and Asset Management Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1540 Calvert County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Emergency Services Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0767 Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining Senator Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0816 (HB0651) Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1370) Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0935 Transportation - Regional Authorities - Established Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 6:45 PM
Click to return on the top page