Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Camps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223
Title
Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0279 (SB0453/CH0280)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0280 (HB0637/CH0279)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0223 Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0400 Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0637 /CH0279 (SB0453/CH0280) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1307 Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act) Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0453 /CH0280 (HB0637/CH0279) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page