Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Camps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223 (SB0049)
Title
Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0430 (SB0296/CH0431)
Title
Land Use – Agritourism – Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0982)
Title
Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 (HB0223)
Title
Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 /CH0431 (HB0558/CH0430)
Title
Land Use - Agritourism - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 /CH0186
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 (HB1465)
Title
Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0223 (SB0049) Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0558 /CH0430 (SB0296/CH0431) Land Use – Agritourism – Definition Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1465 (SB0982) Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0049 (HB0223) Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0296 /CH0431 (HB0558/CH0430) Land Use - Agritourism - Definition Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0817 /CH0186 Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0982 (HB1465) Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page