Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Cannabis -see also- Smoking and Vaping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 (SB0900)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232
Title
Maryland Agricultural Commission – Hemp Industry Member
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 (SB0562)
Title
Agriculture – License to Produce Hemp – Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0143)
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry – Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453
Title
Health - Medical Cannabis Reauthorization Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0190)
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0461)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925
Title
Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143 (HB0324)
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 (HB0543)
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB1269)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0683)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504
Title
Discrimination in Employment – Use of Medical Cannabis – Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0249)
Title
Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884
Title
Medical Cannabis – Visiting Qualifying Patients
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0217)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0217 (SB0900) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0232 Maryland Agricultural Commission – Hemp Industry Member Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0238 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0249 (SB0562) Agriculture – License to Produce Hemp – Limitation Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0324 (SB0143) Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0415 Firearms – Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry – Medical Cannabis Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0453 Health - Medical Cannabis Reauthorization Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0488 Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0543 (SB0190) Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0589 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0683 (SB0461) Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0706 Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0925 Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0143 (HB0324) Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0190 (HB0543) Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0201 (HB1269) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0461 (HB0683) Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 (HB0589) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 Discrimination in Employment – Use of Medical Cannabis – Prohibition Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0249) Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0884 Medical Cannabis – Visiting Qualifying Patients Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0217) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page