Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cannabis -see also- Smoking and Vaping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0045
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075 /CH0459
Title
Maryland Agricultural Commission - Hemp Industry Member
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0333)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry – Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Employment – Workers’ Compensation and Workplace Discrimination – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 (SB0788)
Title
Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325 (SB0772)
Title
Child in Need of Assistance - Neglect - Marijuana Use
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286
Title
Firearms – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0351)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628
Title
Medical Cannabis - Grower License - Number and Licensed Processors
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722
Title
Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1325)
Title
Child in Need of Assistance - Neglect - Marijuana Use
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1078)
Title
Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensaries – Operation at Multiple Locations
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0045 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0075 /CH0459 Maryland Agricultural Commission - Hemp Industry Member Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0351 (SB0333) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0482 Firearms – Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry – Medical Cannabis Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
HB0628 Employment – Workers’ Compensation and Workplace Discrimination – Use of Medical Cannabis Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1078 (SB0788) Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1325 (SB0772) Child in Need of Assistance - Neglect - Marijuana Use Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
SB0286 Firearms – Use of Medical Cannabis Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 (HB0351) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 Medical Cannabis - Grower License - Number and Licensed Processors Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0722 Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB1325) Child in Need of Assistance - Neglect - Marijuana Use Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 (HB1078) Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0844 Medical Cannabis – Dispensaries – Operation at Multiple Locations Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:23 PM
Click to return on the top page