Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Cannabis Production

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0925)
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Sales Between Cannabis Businesses and Cannabis Nurseries - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Queen Anne's County - Licensed Cannabis Dispensary and Processor Locations - Distance Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB0413)
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0413 (SB0925) Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0619 Sales and Use Tax - Sales Between Cannabis Businesses and Cannabis Nurseries - Exemption Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 Queen Anne's County - Licensed Cannabis Dispensary and Processor Locations - Distance Requirements Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 (HB0413) Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2025 11:16 AM
Click to return on the top page